+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/20/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 27, 2019: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8