+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Motion to reject withdrawn.
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1/14/2014
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to pass H., Ayes 28 Nays 66
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0582)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0339)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0088)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 4
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0088
Amendment 1-0 to SB0780
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 25
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 4
April 8, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2