+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2021,07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 478
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0189)
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0266)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 28, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
April 20, 2021: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
April 6, 2021: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor