+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 290
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 11, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor