+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 266
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 4
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0253)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0082)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
March 11, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
March 6, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor