+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor