+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
- Pub. Ch. 110
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/10/2021
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2021: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 16, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9