+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 25
- Effective date(s) 03/29/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/13/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/7/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/28/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/21/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
March 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 7
March 7, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor