+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 553
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/5/2018
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 1/31/2018
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
January 31, 2018: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor