+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 69
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0145)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/18/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 3/13/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0145
Amendment 1-0 to SB0072
+ − Vote
March 13, 2013: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 8