+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 170
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 26, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor