+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 230
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Recalled from Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor