+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/3/2017
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5/3/2017
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/1/2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5/1/2017
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor