+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 21, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 21, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 17, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 17, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor