+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 451
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 23, Nays 1 (Amendment 3 - HA0476)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 13, PNV 5
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0476)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0424)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0361)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 2, PNV 3
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0394)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/7/2015
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/7/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 5
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 5
April 14, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
April 7, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 7, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor