+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/2/2016
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 2, 2016: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendments, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor