+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/09/2015
- Pub. Ch. 91
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 14
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0090)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0052)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 withdrawn.
- Senate adopted Amendment 2
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/10/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor