+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 145
- Effective date(s) 04/17/2017
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 10, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0198)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0127)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 19
April 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 19
March 23, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 6
March 14, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor