+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0447)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0410)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0263)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. w/ am., ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/12/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
March 26, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor