+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/8/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor