+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed in S. C&L Comm. ayes 1, nays 2, PNV 4
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0308
Amendment 1-0 to SB0666
+ − Vote
March 27, 2013: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4