+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 170
- Effective date(s) 04/24/2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/10/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
April 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
April 5, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
April 5, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor