+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 407
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 3
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0442)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 25, Nays 2 PNV 4
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0401)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0443)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/5/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE TIME CERTAIN MOTION THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
April 10, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor