+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0110)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
March 17, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
March 17, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor