+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 482
- Effective date(s) 05/20/2013
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 & 2
- S. refused to concur in am. 1
- S. refused to concur in am. 2
- H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/19/2013
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Dean, Goins, Camper)
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 cal. for 4/19/2013
- S. refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Tracy, Harper, Niceley)
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0357)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/19/2013
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0575)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0407)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0225)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 89
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
April 8, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 11
March 20, 2013: S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor