+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 247
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 2, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor