+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor