+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 541
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/26/2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor