+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/14/2020
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2020
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor