+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2015: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 8, 2015: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor