+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 165
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/1/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 28
March 26, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 7