+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 74
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/10/2021
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2021: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor