+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. C&L Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 7 PNV 0
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. C&L Comm. 3/19/2013
- Ref. to S. C&L Comm.
- Recalled from S. H&W Comm.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 27, 2013: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor