+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to last cal.
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/5/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/5/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor