+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 99
- Effective date(s) 04/08/2019
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 70, Nays 21, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 4, PNV 1
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 12, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8