+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 120
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/14/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. to 3/12/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 14, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
March 12, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor