+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor