+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2008: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2008: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
April 29, 2008: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2008: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Beavers
- Yeas: 9
April 17, 2008: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor