+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.