+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1026
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
- Re-ref to S. Cal. Comm.
- Move to Heel
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2018
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on final calendar of 2018
- Senate Reset on final calendar of 2018
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/12/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/28/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Vote
March 28, 2018: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor