+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 12, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor