+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 372
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2017: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 28, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 28, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor