+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 5
- Effective date(s) 03/15/2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/27/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/22/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2017: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8