+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 359
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 1 (Amendment 2 - HA0448)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0334)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0448)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 4, PNV 0
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0295)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 24, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 4
April 17, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 10, 2019: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor