+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 511
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/2/2019
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2019
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 5/2/19
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 2, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor