+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 4/28/2021
- Pub. Ch. 256
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
March 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 7
March 2, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor