+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/03/2022
- Pub. Ch. 967
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0803)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0847)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 11, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 30, 2022: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor