+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/7/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/10/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/24/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor