+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 168
- Effective date(s) 04/24/2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/27/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
March 21, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 21, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor