+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor